EP2604385 - Locking means for crimping pliers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements Pierre Gréhal et Cie SA 2 Avenue du Bosquet 95560 Baillet en France / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Etablissements Pierre Grehal et Cie SA 2 Avenue du Bosquet 95560 Baillet en France / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marcon, Lionel 82 rue Maréchal Joffre 95620 Parmain / FR | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Corret, Hélène, et al Cabinet Benech 15, rue d'Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Reboussin, Yohann Mickaël Noël, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/25] | Rataboul, Xavier, et al Cabinet Orès 36 rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12197307.7 | 14.12.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | DE20111088755 | 15.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011088755 | [2013/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2604385 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2604385 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25B7/10, B25B7/14 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
B25B7/14 (EP);
B21D39/03 (EP);
B25B7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2013/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verriegelungseinrichtung für eine Crimpzange | [2013/25] | English: | Locking means for crimping pliers | [2013/25] | French: | Moyens de verrouillage pour une pince à sertir | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 14.12.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/24] | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 13.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 13.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2149427 (IRWIN IND TOOL CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0006] - [0015] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 5 [I] 3,4; | [A]GB576142 (EDGAR DALE BALL, et al) [A] 1,5 * page 3, lines 9-113 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0304173 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 7 * * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 49 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4158302 (O LOUGHLIN FRANCIS A) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 30 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6085422 (HIRABAYASHI SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 19 * * figure 4 * |