EP2604667 - Package structure of electronic modules with silicone sealing frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prologium Holding Inc. PO Box 309 Ugland House Grand Cayman, KY1-1104 / KY | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Szu-Nan 3F, No. 38, Lane 405, Sec. 6, Zhongshan N. Rd. Taipei / TW | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12197378.8 | 15.12.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | TW20110146902 | 16.12.2011 Original published format: TW 100146902 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2604667 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2604667 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2604667 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/10 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
C09K3/1018 (EP);
H01L23/28 (KR);
G02F1/1339 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2013/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Package-Struktur von elektronischen Baugruppen mit Silikon Dichtrahmen | [2016/46] | English: | Package structure of electronic modules with silicone sealing frame | [2013/25] | French: | Structure d'emballage de modules électroniques avec cadre de scellement en silicone | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/25] | Package-Struktur von elektronischen Baugruppen mit Silikondichtrahmen | Examination procedure | 30.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2012 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | RS | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | IE | 15.12.2017 | LU | 15.12.2017 | MT | 15.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2009245782 (TDK CORP) [X] 1-5,7,11 * abstract * [I] 6,8-10,12-14; | [XI]EP1998087 (NOK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0036]; figure - * [I] 6,8-14; | [XI]US2002164476 (KAHL HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] , [0029] , [4142]; figures 1c, 3b * [I] 6,8-14; | [A]EP1728829 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] * |