EP2587354 - Touch panel and output method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan District Taoyuan City 330 / TW | [2015/13] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Rd. Taoyuan City Taoyuan County / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tseng, Hsu-Hsiang c/o HTC Corporation No. 23 Xinghua Rd. Taoyuan City Taoyuan County / TW | 02 /
Tun, Yun-Lon c/o HTC Corporation No. 23 Xinghua Rd. Taoyuan City Taoyuan County / TW | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/18] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Hafenspitze Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12197770.6 | 26.05.2010 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | TW098127375 | 14.08.2009 Original published format: TW 098127375 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2587354 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2587354 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2587354 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044, G06F3/045, G06F3/041 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G06F3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2013/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Berührungstafel und Ausgabeverfahren dafür | [2013/18] | English: | Touch panel and output method therefor | [2013/18] | French: | Panneau tactile et son procédé de sortie | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 09.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10163879.9 / EP2284669 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2010 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 26.05.2016 | LU | 26.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 26.05.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.05.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.05.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.05.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008316182 (ANTILA MIKA [FI], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0029] - [0 44] , [0 59] , [0 69] - [0080] *; | [X]EP1811364 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009073134 (HUANG CHENG-WEN [TW], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 9; claims 1-9, 15, 18-20 *; | [X]US2009189875 (MA ZHONGMING [CA]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0054] * * figures 1,5 * * claims 1-3, 5, 18-20 *; | [X]EP2026179 (IEE SARL [LU]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0014]; figures 9, 10 *; | [X]US2008018611 (SERBAN BOGDAN [LU], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]GB2456311 (YOUNG FAST OPTOELECTRONICS CO [TW]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2005190161 (HONG HEE J [KR], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0013]; claims 1-10 *; | [X]US2001013855 (FRICKER JEAN-PHILIPPE [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]US2009096762 (HINATA SHOJI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]US2009194341 (NOUSIAINEN JARI [FI]) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2009166097 (CHANG CHIN-FU [TW]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 2; claim 5 *; | [A]US2008207254 (PIERCE PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] *; | [E]US2013106775 (YOO DONG-HYUN [KR]) [E] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] *; | [E]US2014013865 (WHITE RICHARD [GB], et al) [E] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] * |