Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8205432 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2012 | B2 | US2009090096 | 09.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90660207 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10151248 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2018 | B2 | US2013004297 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90660207 | 03.10.2007 | US201113340838 | 30.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2610461 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2019 | B1 | EP2610461 | 13.07.2016 | A3 | EP2610461 | 03.07.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113340838 | 30.12.2011 |