EP2607845 - Rotation angle detecting apparatus and surveying instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/08] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumagai, Kaoru c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Anai, Tetsuji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Osaragi, Kazuki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ohtomo, Fumio c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 12197876.1 | 18.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | JP20110277661 | 19.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011277661 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2607845 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2607845 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2607845 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01B11/26, G01D5/347, G01D5/245 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP,US);
G01B11/26 (US);
G01D5/2457 (EP,US);
G01D5/3473 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | G01C15/00, G01B11/26, G01D5/347 | ||
Former IPC [2013/26] | G01C15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2013/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Drehwinkelerkennungsvorrichtung und Überwachungsinstrument | [2013/26] | English: | Rotation angle detecting apparatus and surveying instrument | [2013/26] | French: | Appareil de détection d'angle de rotation et instrument d'arpentage | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2012 | AL | 20.02.2019 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | HR | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | MK | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | RS | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | SM | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | NO | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.12.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 18.12.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE19750474 (STEGMANN MAX ANTRIEBSTECH [DE]) [I] 1-11 * column 2, lines 17-47; figure 1 *; | [I]US2011044561 (BRAUNECKER BERNHARD [CH], et al) [I] 1-11* paragraphs [0053] , [0056]; figures 1A,1B,2A,3A,3B,6C * | Examination | US7214917 |