EP2746191 - Packaging for container filled with a pharmaceutical product and having a tubular shaped body and method for assembling said packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuehn, Bernd Myliusstrasse 54 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/26] | Bas, Fabien Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12197894.4 | 18.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746191 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/42, A61M5/00, B65D5/50, B65D83/04 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
B65D5/5083 (EP);
B65D83/0472 (EP);
B65D85/42 (EP);
A61M5/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verpackung für einen mit einem pharmazeutischen Produkt gefüllten Behälter und röhrenförmiger Körper und Verfahren zur Montage der Verpackung | [2014/26] | English: | Packaging for container filled with a pharmaceutical product and having a tubular shaped body and method for assembling said packaging | [2014/26] | French: | Emballage pour récipient rempli d'un produit pharmaceutique et présentant un corps de forme tubulaire et méthode d'assemblage de l'emballage | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE1536321 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [X] 1-9,11,12,15 * pages 1-14 * * figures 1-8 * [I] 10,13,14; | [X]FR2833580 (SMURFIT SOCAR SA [FR]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * page 1 - page 5 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE531330 (ASTRA WERKE G M B H) [X] 1-5,7,11 * page 1, lines 1-57 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6923319 (ERICKSON THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 14 * figure 2b *; | [A]EP2057959 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 14 * figure 23 *; | [A]US5245117 (WITHERS L ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 14 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | EP0042336 | EP0028995 |