EP2746188 - Packaging for containers filled with a pharmaceutical product and having a tubular shaped body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuehn, Bernd Myliusstrasse 54 60323 FRANKFURT AM MAIN / DE | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12197895.1 | 18.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746188 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/04, A61M5/00, B65D5/50, B65D85/42 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A61M5/002 (EP);
B65D5/5083 (EP);
B65D73/02 (EP);
B65D83/0472 (EP);
B65D85/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verpackung für mit einem pharmazeutischen Produkt gefüllte Behälter und röhrenförmiger Körper | [2014/26] | English: | Packaging for containers filled with a pharmaceutical product and having a tubular shaped body | [2014/26] | French: | Emballage destiné à des contenants remplis d'un produit pharmaceutique et présentant un corps de forme tubulaire | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 02.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012145585 (DOYLE MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,14,15 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0111] * * figures 1-42 * [I] 6,12,13; | [AD]US2771214 (LEFEBVRE FRANK J) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0042336 | EP0028995 | US2771214 | US4274550 | EP1794063 | GB2223001 |