EP2608167 - Screen capture to a mobile device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGT 6355 S. Buffalo Drive Las Vegas, NV 89113 / US | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states IGT 9295 Prototype Drive Reno, Nevada 89521-8986 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LeMay, Steven G. 5398 S. Elk River Road Reno, NV 89511 / US | 02 /
Nelson, Dwayne R. 5488 Aleman Drive Las Vegas, NV 89113 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12198030.4 | 19.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | US201113333659 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: US201113333659 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608167 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
G07F17/3225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildschirmaufnahme an eine mobile Vorrichtung | [2013/26] | English: | Screen capture to a mobile device | [2013/26] | French: | Capture d'écran pour dispositif mobile | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010042375 (WMS GAMING INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 45] , [0 49] , [0 58] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 2-15; | [I]US2011111862 (ALLEN JEFFREY L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063] * * figure 4 * | by applicant | US20080209608 |