EP2745691 - Substituted imidazole compounds and their use as fungicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grammenos, Wassilios, Dr. Alexander-Fleming-Strasse 13 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Craig, Ian, Robert, Dr. Carl-Bosch-Strasse 70 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Boudet, Nadege, Dr. Auf der Au 12 69502 Hemsbach / DE | 04 /
Müller, Bernd, Dr. Stockingerstrasse 7 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
Dietz, Jochen, Dr. Kaethe-Kollwitz-Strasse 26a 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 06 /
Lauterwasser, Erica, May, Wilson, Dr. Bürklin-Wolf-Strasse 39 47157 Wachenheim / DE | 07 /
Lohmann, Jan, Klaas, Dr. Mühltorstrasse 2a 67245 Lambsheim / DE | 08 /
Grote, Thomas, Dr. Im Höhnhausen 18 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 09 /
Haden, Egon, Dr. Maulbronner Hof 24 67346 Speyer / DE | 10 /
Escribano Cuesta, Ana, Dr. Speizenstrasse 16 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2014/26] | Application number, filing date | 12198085.8 | 19.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2745691 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/50, A01P3/00, C07D405/06 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A01N43/50 (EP);
C07D405/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Substituierte Imidazolverbindungen und deren Verwendung als Fungizidwirkstoffe | [2014/26] | English: | Substituted imidazole compounds and their use as fungicides | [2014/26] | French: | Composés d'imidazole substitués et leur utilisation comme fongicides | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]EP0029355 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [ID]EP0080071 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0091286 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | by applicant | US3296272 | US3325503 | EP0029355 | DE3000244 | DE3019028 | DE3140276 | EP0080071 | EP0091286 | US4479004 | EP0141317 | EP0152031 | EP0226917 | EP0243970 | EP0256503 | EP0374753 | EP0392225 | EP0427529 | EP0428941 | EP0451878 | EP0532022 | WO9307278 | EP0648723 | WO9534656 | DE19650197 | WO9846608 | WO9914187 | WO9924413 | WO9927783 | WO0029404 | WO0046148 | EP1028125 | EP1035122 | WO0065913 | DE10021412 | WO0154501 | EP1122244 | WO0156358 | WO0215701 | WO0222583 | EP1201648 | WO0240431 | JP2002316902 | WO03010149 | WO03011853 | WO03014103 | WO03016286 | WO03018810 | WO03052073 | WO03053145 | WO03061388 | WO03064572 | WO03066609 | WO03074491 | WO2004046068 | WO2004049804 | WO2004083193 | CN1631888 | WO2005063721 | WO2005087772 | WO2005087773 | WO2005120234 | WO2005123689 | WO2005123690 | WO2006015866 | WO2006087325 | WO2006087343 | DE102005009458 | WO2007082098 | WO2007090624 | WO2010099527 | WO2010146114 | WO2011028657 | JP2011251945 | WO2012025506 |