EP2574641 - Binders and materials made therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation GmbH One Knauf Drive Shelbyville, IN 46176-1496 / US | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWIFT, Brian c/o ARC-IP 4 Rue Emile Francqui 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | 02 /
XU, Ruijian c/o ARC-IP 4 Rue Emile Francqui 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | 03 /
KISSELL, Ronald c/o ARC-IP 4 Rue Emile Francqui 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Farmer, Guy Dominic ARC-IP sprl rue Emile Francqui, 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | Application number, filing date | 12198250.8 | 26.07.2006 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | US20050702456P | 26.07.2005 Original published format: US 702456 P | US20050743071P | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 743071 P | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2574641 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2574641 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L5/00, C08L3/00, C03C25/32, C07H5/04, C08F251/02, C08L51/02, B29C70/68, C03C17/28, C09D105/00, C09D167/04, E04B1/78, E04B1/84, F16L59/02, F16L59/14 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
C03C25/321 (EP);
B29C70/68 (BR,US);
C09J105/00 (KR);
B32B17/04 (EA);
C09D167/04 (BR,US);
C03C17/28 (BR,US);
C03C25/14 (BR,US);
C07H5/04 (EP,BR,US);
C08B37/0009 (KR);
C08F251/02 (EP,BR,US);
C08L3/02 (EA);
C08L5/00 (KR);
C08L51/02 (EP,BR,US);
C08L79/02 (EA);
C09D105/00 (BR,US);
C09D5/08 (US);
E04B1/78 (BR,US);
E04B1/84 (US);
E04B1/88 (BR,US);
F16L59/026 (BR,US);
F16L59/14 (BR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/14] | C08L5/00, C08L3/00, C03C25/32, C07H5/04, C08F251/02, C08L51/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2013/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bindemittel und damit hergestellte Materialien | [2013/14] | English: | Binders and materials made therewith | [2013/14] | French: | Liants et substances conçues au moyen de ceux-ci | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 01.03.2017 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 06.04.2017 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 18.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/40] | 04.08.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/40] | Appeal following examination | 28.11.2019 | Appeal received No. T0611/20 | 28.02.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.08.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | 04.08.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06788492.4 / EP1919999 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060788492) is 20.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0583086 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [Y]US5582682 (FERRETTI ARTHUR [US]); | [Y]US5977232 (ARKENS CHARLES THOMAS [US], et al); | [Y]EP1486547 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]); | [Y]US2005059770 (SRINIVASAN RAMJI [US], et al); | by applicant | US5318990 | US5661213 | US6136916 | US6331350 |