|
25.08.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2020 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2020 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.04.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |