EP2611091 - Hierarchical modulation and demodulation apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | For all designated states Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Yonsei University Yonsei University 134 Sinchon-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-479 / KR | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Chang Soon Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Young Soo Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 03 /
Bae, Chi Sung Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 04 /
Hwang, Hyo Sun Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 05 /
Kim, Yong Ok Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Yonsei University Yonsei Univ. 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-479 / KR | 06 /
Jung, Min Chae Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Yonsei University Yonsei Univ. 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-479 / KR | 07 /
Choi, Soo Yong Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Yonsei University Yonsei Univ. 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-479 / KR | 08 /
Hwang, Kyu Ho Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Yonsei University Yonsei Univ. 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-479 / KR | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12198345.6 | 20.12.2012 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | KR20120000144 | 02.01.2012 Original published format: KR 20120000144 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2611091 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2611091 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/34 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
H04L27/3488 (EP,US);
H04B14/04 (KR);
H03M13/00 (KR);
H04L27/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hierarchische Modulations- und Entmodulationsvorrichtung und Verfahren | [2013/27] | English: | Hierarchical modulation and demodulation apparatus and method | [2013/27] | French: | Appareil de modulation et de démodulation hiérarchique et procédé | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 11.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003072050 (VRAZEL MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2010303167 (JUANG RONG-TERNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 5 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] *; | [Y] - SADOUGH S M S ET AL, "On the Interaction Between Channel Coding and Hierarchical Modulation", COMMUNICATIONS, 2009. ICC '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090614), ISBN 978-1-4244-3435-0, pages 1 - 5, XP031506229 [Y] 1-15 * figures 2-3 * * Section I to III * | [Y] - IBRAHIM ALSOLAMI ET AL, "Multiresolution PPM for Broadcasting over Asymmetric Photon Counting Channels", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20111201), vol. 15, no. 12, doi:10.1109/LCOMM.2011.100611.111175, ISSN 1089-7798, pages 1268 - 1270, XP011389286 [Y] 1-15 * Section III;; figures 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCOMM.2011.100611.111175 | [A] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Framing Structure, channel coding and modulation for Satellite Services to Handheld devices (SH) below 3 GHz European Broadcasting Union Union Européenne de Radio-Télévision EBUÜER; Draft ETSI EN 302 583", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070801), vol. BC, no. V1.0.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014039607 [A] 1-15 * Section 5.1 * * Section 5.7.4.3 * | [A] - PAPKE L ET AL, "Different iterative decoding algorithms for combined concatenated coding and multiresolution modulation", COMMUNICATIONS, 1994. ICC '94, SUPERCOMM/ICC '94, CONFERENCE RECORD, ' SERVING HUMANITY THROUGH COMMUNICATIONS.' IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENC E ON NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 1-5 MAY 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940501), doi:10.1109/ICC.1994.368903, ISBN 978-0-7803-1825-0, pages 1249 - 1254, XP010126691 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1994.368903 | [A] - SUAYB S ARSLAN ET AL, "Coded Hierarchical Modulation for Wireless Progressive Image Transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20111101), vol. 60, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TVT.2011.2163179, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 4299 - 4313, XP011388436 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVT.2011.2163179 | [A] - SIMON GORTZEN ET AL, "Hierarchical generalized Cantor set modulation", WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS (ISWCS), 2011 8TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20111106), doi:10.1109/ISWCS.2011.6125309, ISBN 978-1-61284-403-9, pages 56 - 60, XP032090036 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWCS.2011.6125309 | [A] - PAPKE L ET AL, "COMBINED MULTILEVEL TURBO-CODE WITH MR-MODULATION", COMMUNICATIONS - GATEWAY TO GLOBALIZATION. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. SEATTLE, JUNE 18 - 22, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950618), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-2487-9, pages 668 - 672, XP000533098 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |