EP2746512 - Actuator device for automatically activating the vehicle door of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minebea AccessSolutions Deutschland GmbH Waldstrasse 2 85253 Erdweg / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states U-Shin Deutschland Zugangssysteme GmbH Waldstrasse 2 85253 Erdweg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kummer, M. Frank c/o Valeo Sicherheitssysteme GmbH Waldstrasse 2 85253 Erdweg / DE | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2024/27] |
Former [2014/27] | Larger, Solène, et al U-Shin France SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 2-10, rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12198355.5 | 20.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746512 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2746512 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/614 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
E05F15/614 (EP,US);
F16H1/32 (US);
E05Y2201/618 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/716 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/72 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/531 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | E05F15/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2014/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Aktuatorvorrichtung zum automatischen Betätigen der Fahrzeugtür eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2014/26] | English: | Actuator device for automatically activating the vehicle door of a motor vehicle | [2014/26] | French: | Dispositif d'actionneur pour l'activation automatique de la porte d'un véhicule motorisé | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.04.2023 | 17.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB1593971 (TAYLOR HITEC LTD); | [XAYI]US2002104267 (SATO MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [YD]EP1940012 (VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2010186528 (HILLEN JOERG [DE], et al); | [E]EP2543808 (VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) | Examination | JP2003139078 | WO2005092575 | by applicant | EP1940012 |