EP2574914 - Devices, Systems and Methods of Detecting Defects in Workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theta Technologies Limited The Innovation Centre University of Exeter Rennes Drive Exeter EX4 4RN / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states University of Exeter The Queen's Drive Exeter, Devon EX4 4QJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armitage, Peter 22 Lyncombe Close Rosebarn Park Exeter, EX4 5EJ / GB | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/14] | 01 /
Armitage, Peter Rosebarn Park Exeter, EX4 5EJ / GB | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Southgate House Southgate Street Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL1 1UB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Butler, Daniel James, et al Wynne-Jones, Laine & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/14] | Butler, Daniel James, et al Wynne-Jones, Laine & James LLP 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12198484.3 | 04.12.2008 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | GB20070023622 | 04.12.2007 Original published format: GB 0723622 | US20070013130P | 12.12.2007 Original published format: US 13130 P | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2574914 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2574914 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/12, G01N29/34, G01N29/42, G01N29/44 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G01N29/043 (EP,US);
G01N29/04 (US);
G01N29/12 (EP,US);
G01N29/348 (EP,US);
G01N29/42 (EP,US);
G01N29/4445 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen, Systeme und Verfahren zur Erkennung von Mängeln an Werkstücken | [2013/14] | English: | Devices, Systems and Methods of Detecting Defects in Workpieces | [2013/14] | French: | Dispositifs, systèmes et procédés de détection de défauts dans des pièces | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 09.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08857621.0 / EP2223099 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080857621) is 20.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5578888 (SAFABAKHSH ALI R [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 49 - line 54 * * column 4, line 7 - line 20; figure 7 *; | [A]EP1262160 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0103] *; | [Y]EP1526379 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0002] - [0009]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] *; | [A]WO2007000047 (NIMTECH INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0045] * |