Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9345441 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2013338490 | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011121708 | 20.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2606825 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011121708 | 20.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011121708 | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011121708 | 20.12.2011 |