EP2606825 - Image producing apparatus and method for nuclear imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SurgicEye GmbH Friedenstrasse 18a 81671 München / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wendler, Thomas Brucknerstr. 25 81677 München / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12198715.0 | 20.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | DE201110121708 | 20.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011121708 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606825 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B19/00, // A61B6/12 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A61B6/481 (EP,US);
A61B6/466 (US);
A61B1/00045 (US);
A61B1/043 (US);
A61B1/063 (US);
A61B1/227 (US);
A61B1/233 (US);
A61B1/2676 (US);
A61B1/2733 (US);
A61B1/2736 (US);
A61B1/303 (US);
A61B1/307 (US);
A61B1/31 (US);
A61B1/3135 (US);
A61B1/317 (US);
A61B5/061 (US);
A61B5/067 (US);
A61B6/037 (US);
A61B6/425 (EP,US);
A61B6/4258 (EP,US);
A61B6/4417 (US);
A61B6/464 (US);
A61B6/483 (US);
A61B6/5258 (US);
A61B6/56 (US);
A61B8/0841 (US);
A61B8/4245 (EP,US);
G01T1/161 (EP);
A61B2090/365 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B6/12 (EP,US);
A61B6/583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsapparat und -methode zur Nuklearbildgebung | [2013/26] | English: | Image producing apparatus and method for nuclear imaging | [2013/26] | French: | Appareil et méthode de génération d'images pour imagerie nucléaire | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 24.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/50] | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003187349 (KANEKO MAMORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2009259123 (NAVAB NASSIR [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0036]; figure 5 *; | [Y]US2010266171 (WENDLER THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-14 * * paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0213] *; | [A]WO2011038444 (UNIV WOLLONGONG [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 25; figures 1-8 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 23 * * page 18, line 19 - line 22 * | by applicant | US6021341 | US6167296 | US6317622 | US6456869 | US6510336 | US6602488 | US6643538 | WO2007131561 | DE102008025151 |