EP2649977 - Skin treatment device with integrated dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states La Pierres, Inc. 1620 Rangewood Place San Jose CA 95138 / US | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wahng, Chao Uei c/o La Pierres, Inc. 1620 Rangewood Place San Jose, CA 95138 / US | 02 /
Zhou, Yuchen c/o La Pierres, Inc. 1620 Rangewood Place San Jose, CA 95138 / US | 03 /
Tieu, Hieu c/o La Pierres, Inc. 1620 Rangewood Place San Jose, CA 95138 / US | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [2015/51] |
Former [2013/42] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 12250092.9 | 11.04.2012 | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2649977 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2649977 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61H23/02 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
A61H23/02 (EP);
A61H2201/105 (EP);
A61H2201/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] |
Former [2013/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Hautbehandlungsvorrichtung mit integriertem Spender | [2013/42] | English: | Skin treatment device with integrated dispenser | [2013/42] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de la peau avec distributeur intégré | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 02.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15197805.3 / EP3011943 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2012 | AL | 16.12.2015 | AT | 16.12.2015 | BE | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | ES | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | HR | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | NL | 16.12.2015 | PL | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | RS | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | IE | 11.04.2016 | LU | 11.04.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 11.04.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.04.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.04.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.04.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011251537 (YEO MYUNG KWON [KR]) [X] 1,2,11-14 * paragraph [0019]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]TWM414957U (PIERRES INC [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2011251526 (KIM HYUN JIN [KR]) [X] 1,3,11-15 * paragraphs [0066] - [0074]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2006276731 (THIEBAUT LAURE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6,11-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4984568 (PERSAUD HARVEY [US]) [X] 1,3-6,11-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005191252 (MITSUI YUKIO [JP]) [X] 1,3,11-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0058]; figures 1,2; claim - * |