12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
27.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
09.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
26.09.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
18.10.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
14.10.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.10.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.06.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
25.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |