Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2482028T | 30.04.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1100310 | 31.01.2011 | EP12290028 | 25.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8689690 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2014 | B2 | US2012192746 | 02.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100310 | 31.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2482028 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2013 | B1 | EP2482028 | 01.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100310 | 31.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2442908T | 14.02.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1100310 | 31.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2971048 | 11.01.2013 | B1 | FR2971048 | 03.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100310 | 31.01.2011 |