EP2653508 - Compositions for paint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imerys S.A. 154 Rue de L'Université 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phipps, Jonathan Barley Wood, Wills Moor Gorran Haven Comwall PL26 6JE / GB | 02 /
Bourgoin, Sophie 51 rue de Seine 75006 Paris / FR | 03 /
Legrix, Anabelle Tregears, Little Trevisco St Austell Comwall PL26 7QL / GB | 04 /
Vinnicombe, Gemma 11 Drinnan Court St Austell Comwall PL25 4PT / GB | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Magnus George Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Johnston, Magnus George Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12290139.0 | 19.04.2012 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2653508 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/04, C09D7/00, C09D7/02, C09D101/02 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
C09D7/43 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (US);
C08K3/346 (US);
C08K9/02 (US);
C09D101/02 (EP,US);
C09D101/284 (EP);
C09D17/004 (EP,US);
C09D5/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D101/284, C08L1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen für Farbe | [2013/43] | English: | Compositions for paint | [2013/43] | French: | Compositions de peinture | [2013/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4487634 (TURBAK ALBIN F [US], et al); | [X]US5964983 (DINAND ELISABETH [FR], et al); | [X]US6183596 (MATSUDA YUJI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2010105847 (BORREGAARD IND [NO], et al); | [X]EP2236545 (OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG [CH]); | [XD]WO2010131016 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO2011141876 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI], et al) | by applicant | EP0614948 | US5576617 | WO2010131016 |