EP2587703 - A data retransmission request device, a data transmitter, and a data retransmission method for multi-tone systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maes, Jochen Pastorijkluis 3 2431 Laakdal / BE | 02 /
Vanderhaegen, Dirk Holland 38 1780 Wemmel / BE | 03 /
Timmers, Michael Persilstraat 35 3020 Herent / BE | 04 /
Van Bruyssel, Danny Domis de Semerpontlaan 18 2820 Bonheiden / BE | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 12290142.4 | 26.04.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | EP20110290495 | 25.10.2011 Original published format: EP 11290495 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587703 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04L27/18, H04L27/34 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
H04L27/2626 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2627 (KR);
H04L1/1607 (EP,US);
H04L1/1825 (EP,US);
H04L1/1864 (EP,US);
H04L1/1893 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Datenrückübertragungsanfragevorrichtung, Datenüberträger und Datenrückübertragungsverfahren für Mehrtonsysteme | [2013/18] | English: | A data retransmission request device, a data transmitter, and a data retransmission method for multi-tone systems | [2013/18] | French: | Dispositif de requête de retransmission de données, émetteur de données et procédé de retransmission de données pour systèmes à plusieurs tonalités | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 15.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1011245 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,8,9,14-16 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0084] * * paragraph [0102] * * claims 1,6,9,11 * * figures 10a,10b *; | [Y]WO03056774 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,9,14-16 * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 3 * * page 13, lines 24-27 * * page 13, line 33 - page 14, line 6 * * page 16, lines 14-21 * * page 16, line 34 - page 17, line 32 ** figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2011069772 (VRZIC SOPHIE [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,9,14-16 * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraphs [0166] , [0167] * * paragraphs [0171] - [0173] * * paragraphs [0175] , [0176] * * paragraph [0178] * * paragraph [0182] * * paragraphs [0184] , [0185] * * paragraphs [0190] - [0192] * * tables 3,4 * * figures 9,10,14-16 * | by applicant | EP1011245 |