EP2672211 - Device for drying biomass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manufacture à Besançon SARL 5 rue Alfred de Vigny 25000 Besançon / FR | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rauch, Winfrid 36 rue de la Perrouse 25115 Pouilly les Vignes / FR | [2013/50] | Application number, filing date | 12290190.3 | 08.06.2012 | [2013/50] | Previously filed application, date | FR20110001698 | 01.06.2011 | [2013/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672211 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F26B3/28, F26B17/00, F26B25/10 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
F26B3/286 (EP);
F26B17/001 (EP);
F26B25/10 (EP);
F26B2200/02 (EP);
Y02B40/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von Biomasse | [2013/50] | English: | Device for drying biomass | [2013/50] | French: | Dispositif pour sécher de la biomasse | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 12.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 18.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2011152855 (LEGACY DESIGN LLC [US], et al) [Y] 6 * figures 1, 2 * * abstract * * paragraph [0046] * [A] 1; | [IY] - Manufacture à Besançon, "Le SéSo", (20111018), URL: http://machines-besancon.com/assets/docs/MaB_Secheur_Solaire_Accelere_SeSo.pdf, (20130214), XP002692196 [I] 1-5,8-11 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7 | [YA] - MaBenligne, "Machines-Besancon.com : Présentation des principes du prototype de séchage solaire accéléré", (20111009), URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=LwiKoc9aLO8, (20130214), XP002692197 [Y] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,5,8-10 | [A] - MaBenligne, "Sécheur solaire accéléré (SéSo) : Reportage à la radio", (20111027), URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=PAtrD-yYXEQ, (20130214), XP002692198 [A] 1,3,5,8-10 * the whole document * | [A] - Jeremy Hugues, "MAB - Séchoir solaire accéléré - Winfrid Rauch - Salon Bois Energie 2012", (20120409), URL: http://www.boisenergie.tv/MAB-Sechoir-solaire-accelere-Winfrid-Rauch-Salon-Bois-Energie-2012_v187.html, (20130214), XP002692199 [A] 1,5,7,9-11 * the whole document * |