EP2713507 - FET RF power detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boucey, Claire c/o NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Riviere, Fabian c/o NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Wane, Sidina c/o NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2014/25] |
Former [2014/14] | 01 /
Boucey, Claire NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
Riviere, Fabian NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
Wane, Sidina NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2014/14] | Application number, filing date | 12290325.5 | 01.10.2012 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713507 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2713507 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45, H04B17/00, G01R21/00 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
H03F3/45197 (EP,US);
G01R21/00 (US);
G01R15/09 (EP);
G01R21/12 (EP);
G01R35/005 (EP);
H04B17/318 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | H03F3/45, H04B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Title | German: | FET-RF-Leistungsdetektor | [2014/14] | English: | FET RF power detector | [2014/14] | French: | Détecteur de puissance RF utilisant FET | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 21.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2012 | AL | 10.12.2014 | AT | 10.12.2014 | BE | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | ES | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | IT | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MK | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | NL | 10.12.2014 | PL | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | RS | 10.12.2014 | SE | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | SM | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | NO | 10.03.2015 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 01.10.2012 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MK | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
TR | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.10.2012 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MK | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.10.2012 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0505751 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2280052 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2004183599 (BANBA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0281] - paragraph [0287]; figures 27,21 *; | [A]US2008297256 (EKEN YALCIN ALPER [TR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0082]; figures 8-13 *; | [A] - GEROSA A ET AL, "An Energy-Detector for Noncoherent Impulse-Radio UWB Receivers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS I: REGULAR PAPERS, IEEE, US, (20090501), vol. 56, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TCSI.2009.2016125, ISSN 1549-8328, pages 1030 - 1040, XP011333428 [A] 1-11 * page 2, column l, line 17 - page 3, column r, line 16; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSI.2009.2016125 | [A] - SEEVINCK E ET AL, "A VERSATILE CMOS LINEAR TRANSCONDUCTOR/SQUARE-LAW FUNCTION CIRCUIT", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19870601), vol. SC-22, no. 3, doi:10.1109/JSSC.1987.1052734, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 366 - 377, XP000039694 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1987.1052734 | by applicant | US5319264 | US2005127986 | US2010097143 | US2011193550 | - EVER SEEVINCK ET AL., "A versatile CMOS Linear Transconductor/Sqaure-Law Function Circuit", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (198706), vol. SC-22, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/JSSC.1987.1052734, XP000039694 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1987.1052734 |