EP2746724 - Micromechanical gyroscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tronics Microsystems S.A. 98 rue du Pré de l'Horme 38920 Crolles / FR | [2017/08] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Tronics Microsystems S.A. 98, Rue du Pré de l'Horme 38926 Crolles / FR | ||
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Tronics Microsystems S.A. 55, Rue du Pré de l'Horme 38926 Crolles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kergueris, Christophe 53 Avenue Doyen Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Gigan, Olivier 51 Avenue Doyen Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Pisella, Christian 360 Avenue du Molard 38140 Beaucroissant / FR | 04 /
Yang, Yongjun No. 115 Hezuo Road Shijiazhuang 050051 / CN | 05 /
Li, Bo No. 113 Hezuo Road Shijiazhuang 050051 / CN | 06 /
Xu, Shujing No. 115 Hezuo Road Shijiazhuang 050051 / CN | [2015/30] |
Former [2015/17] | 01 /
Kergueris, Christophe 53 Avenue Doyen Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Gigan, Olivier 51 Avenue Doyen Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
Pisella, Christian 360 Avenue du Molard 38140 Beaucroissant / FR | |||
04 /
Yang, Yongjun No. 115 Hezuo Road Shijiazhuang 050051 / CN | |||
05 /
Li, Bo No. 88 Yongtai Street Shijiazhuang 050051 / CN | |||
06 /
Xu, Shujing No. 115 Hezuo Road Shijiazhuang 050051 / CN | |||
Former [2014/26] | 01 /
Kergueris, Christophe 53 Avenue Doyen Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Gigan, Olivier 51 Avenue Doyen Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
Pisella, Christian 360 Avenue du Molard 38140 Beaucroissant / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2017/08] |
Former [2014/26] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 12290455.0 | 20.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746724 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2746724 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/5747 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
G01C19/5747 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2014/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mikromechanisches Gyroskop | [2014/26] | English: | Micromechanical gyroscope | [2014/26] | French: | Gyroscope micromécanique | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 03.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2012 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | ES | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US6230563 (CLARK WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [A]US2010186507 (GUENTHNER STEFAN [DE], et al); | [ID]US2010313657 (TRUSOV ALEXANDER A [US], et al) | by applicant | US6230563 | US6718825 | US6837108 | US7036373 | US2010116050 | US2010139399 | US2010313657 |