EP2621194 - Transparent protection switching operation in a pon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk Amsterdam / NL | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk Amsterdam / NL | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mangin, Christophe 1, rue Albert Meusnier 35590 L'HERMITAGE / FR | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12305114.6 | 30.01.2012 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621194 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0067 (EP,US);
H04B10/27 (US);
H04B10/032 (EP,US);
H04B10/272 (EP,US);
H04J2203/006 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0067 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0081 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Transparenter Schutzschaltungsbetrieb in einem PON | [2013/31] | English: | Transparent protection switching operation in a pon | [2013/31] | French: | Opération de commutation de protection transparente dans un réseau optique passif | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 16.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011188849 (HARAMATY ZACHY [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 59 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A] - JIANG JING ET AL, "Research on EPON of broadband access technology and broadband network deployment", ADVANCED COMPUTER THEORY AND ENGINEERING (ICACTE), 2010 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100820), ISBN 978-1-4244-6539-2, pages V3 - 148, XP031759168 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |