EP2634953 - Countermeasure method against side channel analysis for cryptographic algorithms using boolean operations and arithmetic operations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debraize, Blandine GEMALTO SA, Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 MEUDON / FR | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 12305258.1 | 02.03.2012 | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2634953 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
H04L9/003 (EP,US);
H04L9/0631 (US);
H04L9/3234 (US);
H04L9/3242 (US);
H04L9/3263 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gegenmassnahmeverfahren gegen Seitenkanalanalyse auf kryptografische Algorithmen mithilfe Boolescher Operationen und arithmetischer Operationen | [2013/36] | English: | Countermeasure method against side channel analysis for cryptographic algorithms using boolean operations and arithmetic operations | [2013/36] | French: | Procédé de contre-mesure contre l'analyse de canal latéral pour algorithmes cryptographiques utilisant des opérations booléennes et opérations arithmétiques | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005024606 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9,12,13 * page 10, line 10 - page 18, line 27 * [A] 5-8,10,11; | [XA]EP1553490 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,9,12-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0041] * [A] 5-8,10,11 | by applicant | US7334133 | EP1348275 | - "Differential Power Analysis", PAUL KOCHER; JOSHUA JAFFE; BENJAMIN JUN, Proceedings ofAdvances in Cryptology--CRYPTO '99, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), pages 388 - 397 | - "Towards Sound Approaches to Counteract Power-Analysis Attacks", SURESH CHARI; CHARANTJIT S. JUTLA; JOSYULA R. RAO; PANKAJ ROHATGI, Proceedings of Advances in Cryptology--CRYPTO '99, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), pages 398 - 412 | - "DES and Differential Power Analysis--The Duplication Method", LOUIS GOUBIN; JACQUES PATARIN, Proceedings of Workshop on Cryptographic Hardware and Embedded Systems, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (199908), pages 158 - 172 | - "A Sound Method for Switching between Boolean and Arithmetic Masking", LOUIS GOUBIN, CHES'01, SPRINGER LNCS 2162/2001, (2001), pages 3 - 15 | - "A New Algorithm for Switching from Arithmetic to Boolean Masking", JEAN-S6BASTIEN CORON; ALEXEI TCHULKINE, CHES'03, SPRINGER LNCS 2779/2003, (2003), pages 89 - 97 |