EP2654210 - Cross-talk cancellation in a multiband transceiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Xin Elsässer Str. 41 70435 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Bohn, Thomas Wiesbadener Str. 10 70372 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Schlesinger, Heinz Hartweg 11 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | 2SPL Patentanwälte Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12305447.0 | 16.04.2012 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2654210 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2654210 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04, H04B1/00 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
H04B1/005 (EP,US);
H04J1/12 (US);
H03F1/3241 (EP,US);
H04B1/0475 (EP,US);
H04B1/0483 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (US);
H04B2001/0425 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Title | German: | Nebensprechauflösung in einem Multibandsendeempfänger | [2013/43] | English: | Cross-talk cancellation in a multiband transceiver | [2013/43] | French: | Annulation de la diaphonie dans un émetteur-récepteur multibande | [2013/43] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 03.03.2014 | [2014/16] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2012 | AL | 14.05.2014 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | RS | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.04.2012 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MK | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 16.04.2012 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009111399 (NORRIS GEORGE B [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0004] *; | [A]US2010227570 (HENDIN NEIL [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2012083229 (KENINGTON PETER [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * |