EP2713533 - Mobile telecommunication in a cellular network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomatis, Fabrizio 1093, Chemin des Plateaux Fleuris 06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR | 02 /
Demaj, Pierre 300 chemin de la Ginestiere 06200 Nice / FR | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12306165.7 | 26.09.2012 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713533 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
H04B17/327 (EP);
H04B1/70735 (EP);
H04B1/7083 (EP);
H04B7/0413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobile Telekommunikation in einem zellularen Netzwerk | [2014/14] | English: | Mobile telecommunication in a cellular network | [2014/14] | French: | Télécommunications mobiles dans un réseau cellulaire | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2006209761 (MOSHAVI SHIMON [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,11,14,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0019] * [Y] 5-10 [I] 12,13; | [YA]WO03019808 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 5-10 * paragraph [1028] * * paragraph [1033] * * paragraph [1039] - paragraph [1044]; figure 4 * * paragraph [1047] - paragraph [1059]; figure 5 * [A] 1-4,11-15; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Physical channels and mapping of transport channels onto physical channels (FDD) (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.211, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111215), vol. RAN WG1, no. V11.0.0, pages 1 - 60, XP050555012 [A] 1-15 * section 5.3.3.1.1 - section 5.3.3.1.2 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Spreading and modulation (FDD) (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120307), vol. RAN WG1, no. V11.1.0, pages 1 - 43, XP050579990 [A] 1-15 * section 5.2.1 - section 5.2.2 * |