EP2713568 - Label-switched ring network providing a virtual private LAN service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Addeo, Christian Via Bar delle Foie, 10 33170 Pordenone / IT | 02 /
Busi, Italo Via Alfieri, 10 20023 Cerro Maggiore Mi / IT | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Pietra, Giulia, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 19 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12306171.5 | 27.09.2012 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713568 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/705, H04L12/707, H04L12/703, H04L12/721 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
H04L12/4641 (EP);
H04L45/18 (EP);
H04L45/22 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04L45/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Label-switched-Ringnetzwerk mit einem virtuellen privaten LAN-Dienst | [2014/14] | English: | Label-switched ring network providing a virtual private LAN service | [2014/14] | French: | Réseau en anneau à commutation d'étiquettes fournissant un service basé sur un réseau local virtuel privé (LAN) | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 28.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 06.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007165518 (BRUCKMAN LEON [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - MULEY M AISSAOUI M BOCCI ALCATEL-LUCENT P, "Pseudowire Redundancy; rfc6718.txt", PSEUDOWIRE REDUNDANCY; RFC6718.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20120901), pages 1 - 18, XP015084151 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [AD] - HELVOORT VAN H ET AL, "MPLS-TP Ring Protection Switching (MRPS), draft-helvoort-mpls-tp-ring- protection-switching-02.txt", INTERNET CITATION, (20120407), pages 1 - 43, URL: http://tools.ietf.org/id/draft-helvoort-mpls-tp-ring-protection-switching-02.txt, (20130213), XP002692088 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * |