EP2731055 - Method and apparatus for ambient lighting color determination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleureau, Julien 22 rue Emile Bernard 35000 Rennes / FR | 02 /
Bernon, Jeremie L'Université de Technologie de Belfort Montbeliard 90010 Belfort Cedex / FR | 03 /
Danieau, Fabien 4 square du Docteur Guérin 35000 Rennes / FR | 04 /
Guillotel, Philippe 15 rue Auguste Renoir 35770 Vern sur Seiche / FR | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 12306210.1 | 04.10.2012 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2731055 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/46, H05B37/02 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
G06V10/462 (EP,US);
G09G5/02 (US);
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
G09G2360/144 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Farbe des Umgebungslichts | [2014/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for ambient lighting color determination | [2014/20] | French: | Procédé et appareil de détermination de couleur d'éclairage ambiant | [2014/20] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 15.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6611297 (AKASHI YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [YDA]US2007242162 (GUTTA SRINIVAS [IN], et al) [YD] 5,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0189] * [A] 1-4,6-10,12; | [A]US2009059589 (HUANG LING-HSIU [TW], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1 - page 2 *; | [A]US2009175555 (MAHOWALD PETER H [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0068] *; | [XYI]WO2010061334 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,12 * abstract * * page 4 - page 8 * [Y] 5,11 [I] 3,4,9,10; | [AD] - MEUR LE O ET AL, "A coherent computational approach to model bottom-up visual attention", TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, USA, (20060501), vol. 28, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2006.86, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 802 - 817, XP001520793 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2006.86 | by applicant | US2007242162 | - 0. LE MEUR ET AL., "A coherent computational approach to model the bottom-up visual attention", IEEE TRANS. PATTERN. ANAL. MACH. INTELL., vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2006.86, pages 802 - 817, XP001520793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2006.86 |