EP2747367 - Multimedia communication session control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Provenance Asset Group LLC 22 West Ave. Essex, CT 06426 / US | [2018/35] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | ||
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Broeck, Sigurd Zandstraat 98 2980 Zoersel / BE | 02 /
Lou, Zhe Antwerpsestraat 147, bus 17 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Van den Broeck, Marc Kanadastraat 5A 2860 Sint-Katelijne-Waver / BE | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Intellectual Property and Standards Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | Application number, filing date | 12306611.0 | 18.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747367 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04L65/1083 (EP);
H04L65/401 (EP);
H04L65/4015 (EP);
H04L65/403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multimedien-Kommunikationssitzungssteuerung | [2014/26] | English: | Multimedia communication session control | [2014/26] | French: | Commande de session de communication multimédia | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2237533 (AVAYA INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0087] * * figures 2C-2D *; | [X]US7987233 (OSBORNE ROBERT JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 54 * * column 15, line 56 - column 16, line 67 * * figures 4,5,7A,7B *; | [A]WO2012168546 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-10* page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 26 * |