EP2663137 - Uplink transmission power control in MIMO systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Shin Horng 2 Fox Croft Walk Chippenham, Wiltshire SN15 3YB / GB | 02 /
Baker, Matthew P. J. 12 Fir Tree Close Rough Common Canterbury, kent CT2 9DB / GB | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 12360035.5 | 10.05.2012 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663137 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/32, H04W52/34 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
H04W52/325 (EP);
H04W52/346 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP);
H04W52/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Uplink-übertragungsleistungssteuerung in MIMO systemen | [2013/46] | English: | Uplink transmission power control in MIMO systems | [2013/46] | French: | Commande de puissance d'émission de liaison montante dans des systemes MIMO | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/16] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 03.03.2014 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012082192 (PELLETIER BENOIT [CA], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] - [0 60] - [0064] - [0 66] - [0067] - [0079] - [0082] - [0111] - [0116] - [0155] - [0156] - [0172] * * paragraphs [0185] - [0186] - [0214] - [0215] - [0217] , [0227] , [0229] , [0236] - [0239] - [0242] - [0243] - [0245] * * paragraphs [0249] , [0251] - [0252] * * claims 4-6,14-16 *; | [X]WO2010107907 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, lines 10-11,20-25 * * page 2, lines 10-25 * * page 8, lines 22-29 * * page 9, lines 24-29 * * page 10, lines 1-6 * * page 11, lines 28-29 * * page 12, lines 1-10 * * page 21, lines 14-25 * * page 22, line 1 * * page 24, lines 19-21 * * page 26 - page 27 *; | [A]WO2009142572 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 9, line 3.6 * * page 19, lines 4-16 * * page 11, lines 10-19 * * page 12, lines 16-19 * * page 13, lines 1, 14-20 * * page 14, lines 1-2, 20-21 * * page 15, line 1 * * page 18, lines 12-14 * |