EP2737895 - Microparticles with EGF, method of preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxis Pharmaceutical, S.A. Carretera de Arkaute, 5 01192 Arkaute (Alava) / ES | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gainza Lafuente, Eusebio Carretera de Arkaute, 5 01192 Arkaute (Álava) / ES | 02 /
Gainza Lucea, Garazi Universidad del País Vasco Paseo de la Universidad, 7 01006 Vitoria-Gasteiz (Álava) / ES | 03 /
Ibarrola Moreno, Oihane Carretera de Arkaute, 5 01192 Arkaute (Álava) / ES | 04 /
Villullas Rincón, Silvia Carretera de Arkaute, 5 01192 Arkaute (Álava) / ES | 05 /
Del Pozo Pérez, Ángel Carretera de Arkaute, 5 01192 Arkaute (Álava) / ES | 06 /
Pedraz Muñoz, Jose Luis C/ Añua bidea 33 01240 Alegria-Dulantxi (Álava) / ES | 07 /
Hernández Martín, Rosa, María C/ Basalanda n° 2 01196 Etxabarri-Ibiña (Álava) / ES | 08 /
Igartua Olaechea Manuela C/ Baroa n°7 1°B 01010 Vitoria-Gasteiz (Álava) / ES | 09 /
Gómez Mengod, Alfredo Carretera de Arkaute, 5 01192 Arkaute (Álava) / ES | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12382476.5 | 30.11.2012 | [2014/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737895 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K38/18, A61K9/06, A61K47/42, A61K9/16, C07K14/485 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
A61K38/1808 (EP,ES);
A61K47/42 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61K9/1647 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mikropartikel mit EGF, Herstellungsverfahren und Verwendung | [2014/23] | English: | Microparticles with EGF, method of preparation and use | [2014/23] | French: | Microparticules avec EGF, procédé de préparation et d'utilisation | [2014/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN1720989 (SHENZHEN TSINGHUA YUANXING BIO [CN]) [X] 1,5,7-9,11 * examples 1,2,5 * [I] 2-4,6,10,12-15; | [I]EP2075004 (CT INGENIERIA GENETICA BIOTECH [CU]) [I] 1-15 * figure 2; example 4 *; | [ID]EP1987817 (CT INGENIERIA GENETICA BIOTECH [CU]) [ID] 1-15 * figure 4; example 1 *; | [A] - DOWNS E C ET AL, "CALCIUM ALGINATE BEADS AS A SLOW-RELEASE SYSTEM FOR DELIVERING ANGIOGENIC MOLECULES IN VIVO AND IN VITRO", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, WILEY SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES, INC, (19920801), vol. 152, no. 2, doi:10.1002/JCP.1041520225, ISSN 0021-9541, pages 422 - 429, XP002072808 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcp.1041520225 | [A] - FERNANDEZ-MONTEQUIN J I ET AL, "Intralesional administration of epidermal growth factor-based formulation (Heberprot-P) in chronic diabetic foot ulcer: Treatment up to complete wound closure", INTERNATIONAL WOUND JOURNAL, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, UK, (20090201), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1111/J.1742-481X.2008.00561.X, ISSN 1742-4801, pages 67 - 72, XP009143739 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-481X.2008.00561.x | by applicant | WO2007087759 | WO9118999 | - GOLDMAN R, "Growth factors and chronic wound healing: past, present and future", ADV SKIN WOUND CARE, (2004), vol. 17, pages 24 - 35 | - CHU ET AL., "Nanotechnology promotes the full-thickness diabetic wound healing effect of recombinant human epidermal growth factor in diabetic rats", WOUND REPAIR REGEN, (2010), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1524-475X.2010.00612.x, pages 499 - 505, XP055059264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1524-475X.2010.00612.x | - MARIOKA-FUJIMOTO, "Modified enterotoxin signal sequences increase secretion level of the recombinant human epidermal growth factor in Escherichia coli", J BIOL CHEM., (19910125), vol. 266, no. 3, pages 1728 - 32, XP002006626 | - IGARTUA ET AL., "y-Irradiation effects on biopharmaceutical properties of PLGA microspheres loaded with SPf66 synthetic vaccine", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, (2008), vol. 69, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejpb.2007.12.014, pages 519 - 526, XP022664266 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2007.12.014 | - PURAS ET AL., "Encapsulation of A?1-15 in PLGA microparticles enhances serum antibody response in mice immunized by subcutaneous and intranasal routes", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (2011), vol. 44, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejps.2011.07.010, pages 200 - 206, XP028309882 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejps.2011.07.010 | - SALVADOR, "Combination of immune stimulating adjuvants with poly(lactide-co-glycolide", VACCINE, (2012), vol. 30, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.11.057, pages 589 - 596, XP028348171 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.11.057 | - ZHOU, "Effects of Leukemia Inhibitory Factor on Proliferation and Odontoblastic Differentiation of Human Dental Pulp Cells", J ENDOD, (201106), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 819 - 824 | - WALTERA ET AL., "Mesenchymal stem cell-conditioned medium accelerates skin wound healing: An in vitro study of fibroblast and keratinocyte scratch assays", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (2010), vol. 316, doi:doi:10.1016/j.yexcr.2010.02.026, pages 1271 - 1281, XP055192472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2010.02.026 | - LI, "Research of PDGF-BB Gel on the Wound Healing of Diabetic Rats and Its Pharmacodynamics.", J SURG RES, (20071203), vol. 145, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jss.2007.02.044, pages 41 - 8, XP022478041 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jss.2007.02.044 | - "Quantitative and reproducible murine model of excisional wound healing", WOUND REPAIR AND REGENERATION, (2004), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 485 - 492 | - SINHA, "Effects of steel scalpel, ultrasonic scalpel, C02 laser, and monopolar and bipolar electrosurgery on wound healing in guinea pig oral mucosa", LARYNGOSCOPE, (2003), vol. 113, no. 2, pages 228 - 236 |