EP2500401 - A method for processing ash, and an ash processing plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Power Oy P.O. Box 109 33101 Tampere / FI | [2014/20] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Metso Power OY Pl 109 33101 Tampere / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isaksson, Juhani Silmäkkeenkatu 12 33650 Tampere / FI | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Hakola, Unto Tapani, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Hakola, Unto Tapani, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 12397507.0 | 13.03.2012 | [2012/38] | Priority number, date | FI20110005238 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: FI 20115238 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2500401 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/54, F23G5/30 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
F23G5/30 (EP,US);
C10J3/52 (FI);
B01J8/24 (FI);
C10B49/22 (FI);
C10J3/54 (EP,US);
C10J3/56 (EP,US);
F23C10/00 (FI);
F23G5/16 (EP,US);
F23G7/065 (EP,US);
H04B5/45 (EP,US);
H04B5/72 (EP,US);
H04B5/77 (EP,US);
H04B7/04 (US);
C10J2300/0946 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1606 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1628 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1815 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1861 (EP,US);
F23G2202/106 (EP,US);
F23G2203/501 (EP,US);
F23G2209/30 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Asche sowie eine Ascheverarbeitungsanlage | [2012/38] | English: | A method for processing ash, and an ash processing plant | [2012/38] | French: | Procédé de traitement de cendres et installation de traitement de cendres | [2012/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 19.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3847563 (ARCHER D, et al) [A] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0062363 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0043468 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [XI]WO03055962 (FOSTER WHEELER ENERGIA OY [FI], et al) [X] 6-8 * figure 1 * * page 5, lines 24-30 * * page 10, lines 11-19 * * page 11, lines 1-7 * * page 12, lines 17-32 * * claims 1-22 * [I] 1-5,9,10; | [A]WO2006123018 (FOSTER WHEELER ENERGIA OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102009014410 (ETAG PRODUCTION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0044] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | FI110266B |