EP2703544 - Metering container for cleaning agent and method for metering cleaning agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finke, Michael Buschweg 17 33161 Hövelhof / DE | 02 /
Gayk, Karsten, Dr. Preinstraße 63 44265 Dortmund / DE | 03 /
Strothoff, Werner Rüschkamp 24 48336 Sassenberg / DE | [2014/10] | Application number, filing date | 12401181.8 | 28.08.2012 | [2014/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2703544 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2703544 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
A47L15/4463 (EP);
D06F39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2014/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Dosierbehältnis für Reinigungsmittel und Verfahren zur Dosierung von Reinigungsmittel | [2014/10] | English: | Metering container for cleaning agent and method for metering cleaning agent | [2014/10] | French: | Récipient de dosage pour produit de nettoyage et procédé de dosage du produit de nettoyage | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2012 | AL | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | ES | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | MT | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | IE | 28.08.2016 | LU | 28.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0281913 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0249440 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2012095545 (MIXPAKSYSTEM S L [ES], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 4, line 10 - page 7, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4259373 (DEMESSEMAEKERS EMIEL M, et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 21 *; | [A]US2009158782 (HILL CHRIS H [US]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0031]; figures 4,6 *; | [A]US3847279 (MONTGOMERY W) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 11 - column 1, line 15; figure 1 * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 51 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 13; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP2365120 | DE102010027991 |