12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
24.07.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
13.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
15.08.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
14.08.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.08.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.08.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.05.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
22.04.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
21.03.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |
21.03.2014 |
First examination report |
|
10.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.10.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.09.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|