Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2721976 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2014 | B1 | EP2721976 | 23.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12401211 | 18.10.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2515740T | 30.10.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12401211 | 18.10.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2721976T | 28.11.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12401211 | 18.10.2012 |