EP2721976 - Dismountable central discharge of a beverage preparation machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jungclaus, Dirk Ahornweg 14 59302 Oelde / DE | 02 /
Wüstefeld, Michael Hebbelstraße 13 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
van Pels, Ulrich Bonnusstraße 2 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/17] | 01 /
Jungclaus, Dirk Ahornweg 14 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
02 /
Wüstefeld, Michael Hebbelstraße 13 59555 Lippstadt / DE | |||
03 /
van Pels, Ulrich Bonnusstr. 2 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 12401211.3 | 18.10.2012 | [2014/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2721976 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2721976 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
A47J31/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Title | German: | Zerlegbarer Zentralauslauf eines Getränkebereiters | [2014/17] | English: | Dismountable central discharge of a beverage preparation machine | [2014/17] | French: | Sortie centrale démontable d'un dispositif de préparation de boissons | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2012 | AL | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | RS | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | IE | 18.10.2014 | LU | 18.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MK | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2189085 (SPENGLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,16 * figure 3 *; | [X]EP2345354 (JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,16 * figures 1A,1B * | Examination | DE102010038112 | EP2596728 | by applicant | EP2186454 | EP2301396 |