EP2559549 - Device and method for processing sheets made of paper or a different flexible material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Infanger, Rudolf Holzweidweg 12 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2013/08] | Frei Patent Attorneys Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12405082.4 | 09.08.2012 | [2013/08] | Priority number, date | CH20110001339 | 15.08.2011 Original published format: CH 13392011 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2559549 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2559549 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/00, B31F1/10 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
B31F1/0025 (EP,US);
B31F1/10 (EP,US);
B65H29/6609 (EP,US);
B65H45/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2013/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bearbeiten von Bogen aus Papier oder einem anderen flexiblen Material | [2013/08] | English: | Device and method for processing sheets made of paper or a different flexible material | [2013/08] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de traitement de feuilles de papier ou d'un autre matériau flexible | [2013/08] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 12.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.08.2012 | AL | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | MT | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | IE | 09.08.2017 | LU | 09.08.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | GB | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | FR | 31.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2006056580 (PETRATTO S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,15-17,20 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7,19,22 [I] 8-14,18,21; | [Y]US2003092551 (BOSS ROLAND [MX]) [Y] 5-7,19 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039]; figures 5,15 * * paragraph [0046] *; | [Y]DE10220550 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [Y] 22 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055]; figure 6a * | by applicant | WO2011014968 | DE102008002229 | US3729186 | EP2149530 | EP1331105 | US2010304945 | WO2010051651 | WO2008000099 | WO2009143645 |