EP2634155 - Method for producing a porous stone product made from crystalline natural stone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poschacher Natursteinwerke GmbH & Co. KG Poschacherstrasse 7 4222 St. Georgen/Gusen / AT | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sümecz, Franz Am Meisterberg 2a 2294 Marchegg / AT | 02 /
Steiner, Gerhard Neudeckerweg 11 4073 Wilhering / AT | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Keschmann, Marc, et al Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1010 Wien / AT | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 12450013.3 | 02.03.2012 | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2634155 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C04B32/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
C04B32/00 (EP);
C04B2111/40 (EP);
C04B2111/542 (EP);
C04B2111/94 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B32/00, C04B14/048, C04B22/04, C04B38/00, C04B38/0058, C04B38/0061, C04B40/0082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines porösen Steinerzeugnisses aus kristallinem Naturstein | [2013/36] | English: | Method for producing a porous stone product made from crystalline natural stone | [2013/36] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un produit de pierre poreuse en pierre naturelle cristalline | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/38] | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19947247 (VERFAHRENSTECHNISCHES INST SAA [DE]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0017]; examples 1-3 * [I] 15,16; | [I]FR2635772 (HOULLIER GEORGES [FR], et al) [I] 14-16 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 10; figures 4-8; claims 1-4; table 1 *; | [XI]DE2351474 (PERLMOOSER ZEMENTWERKE AG) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12,13 * page 3, line 4 - page 7, line 7 * [I] 3,6-8,11; | [XI]WO2008127069 (KIM SEUNG KWANG [KR]) [X] 1,3,5,7-10,13 * page 2, line 15 - page 6, line 19 * [I] 2,4,6,11,12; | [XI]DE2121574 (B. WÜSTEFELD) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12-14 * page 2, line 2 - page 4, line 19; examples 1-3 * [I] 3,6-8,11,15,16; | [XI]DE2215047 (WUESTEFELD BERND) [X] 1,3,5,8-10,12,13 * page 1, line 49 - page 4, line 8; examples 1-4 * [I] 2,4,6,7,11; | [X]FR417925 (FRANCOIS RIBBE [FR]) [X] 1,3,5,10,12,13 * page 1, column linke, line 1 - page 4, column linke, line 40 *; | [A] - S. Matthes, Mineralogie, Berlin, Springer, (19960101), pages 183 - 184, 5 Aufl, ISBN 3-540-61046-4, XP002679407 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - D. Richter, Allgemeine Geologie, Berlin New York, de Gruyter, (19920101), pages 215 - 222, 4 Aufl, ISBN 3-11-010416-4, XP002679408 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |