Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
30.05.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.05.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.10.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
12.12.2012 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | |
05.12.2012 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | |
05.12.2012 | New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing | |
13.06.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |