EP2663703 - PARKING FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Wöhr GmbH Mirander Strasse 44 70825 Korntal-Münchingen 1 / DE | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARID, Gholamreza Hauptstrasse 37/2 75382 Althengstett / DE | 02 /
NICKEL, Bernd Schwärzenweg 13 78582 Balgheim / DE | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12700119.6 | 10.01.2012 | WO2012EP50291 | Priority number, date | DE20111000115 | 13.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011000115 | [2013/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012095409 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663703 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663703 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/22, E04H6/18 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
E04H6/225 (EP,US);
E04H6/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARKANLAGE | [2013/47] | English: | PARKING FACILITY | [2013/47] | French: | INSTALLATION DE STATIONNEMENT | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 20.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2012 | AL | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | RS | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | SM | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.01.2012 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MK | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.01.2012 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3390791 (BALDWIN WILLIAM W, et al) [A] 4-19,21,23-26 * column 12, line 48 - column 13, line 48 ** column 15, line 58 - column 16, line 37; figures 4A,4B,6,12-15,19,20,21A-21E,22A *; | [A]EP0572928 (BAYRISCHE PARK UND LAGERSYSTEM [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-7,23,24 * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 47; figures 1-15 *; | [A]DE9302819U (REUSS RITA [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-7,22-25 * page 11, line 17 - page 15, line 9; figures 1-14 *; | [A]DE19707237 (THYSSEN RHEINSTAHL TECHNIK GMB [DE]) [A] 1-8,23-26 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-5 * |