EP2675959 - CONCRETE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drössler GmbH Umwelttechnik Marienhütte 6 57080 Siegen / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Drössler GmbH Umwelttechnik Marienhütte 6 57080 Siegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAHL, Michael Eichkamp 11 51580 Reichshof / DE | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger Gihske, Grosse, Klüppel, Kross Bürogemeinschaft Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12700785.4 | 19.01.2012 | WO2012EP00229 | Priority number, date | DE20111011414 | 16.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011011414 | [2013/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110189 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675959 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675959 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/04, E04H7/18, E04H7/28, E04H12/12 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
E04B1/043 (EP,US);
E04C2/04 (US);
E04C2/38 (US);
E04H12/12 (EP,US);
E04H7/18 (EP,US);
E04H7/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETONKONSTRUKTION | [2013/52] | English: | CONCRETE STRUCTURE | [2013/52] | French: | CONSTRUCTION EN BÉTON | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2012 | AL | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | EE | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | EE | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | EE | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | EE | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | EE | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | EE | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HR | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HR | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | |
NO | 04.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2290369 (SIMON FLEISCHMANN) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-4, 7 *; | [A]GB560861 (CHARLES AQUILA VINCENT SMITH, et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 2, 7 *; | [AD]DE20319471U (PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-8* figures 1, 2, 7 * | by applicant | DE9318930U | DE20319471U |