EP2625768 - POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICAL DRIVE OF A MARINE VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETTEMSDAL, Stig Olav Lagmann Dreyers Gate 7 N-7043 Trondheim / NO | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 12700823.3 | 19.01.2012 | WO2012EP50803 | Priority number, date | EP20110152944 | 01.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11152944 | EP20110167247 | 24.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11167247 | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012104152 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2625768 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, B60L7/14, B60L7/16, H02J3/32, H02J4/00, B63H23/24 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
B60L7/14 (EP,KR,US);
H02J3/32 (KR);
B60L7/16 (EP,KR,US);
B63H21/17 (US);
B63H23/24 (EP,KR,US);
B63J3/02 (EP,KR,US);
H02J3/322 (EP,US);
H02J4/00 (EP,KR,US);
B63J2003/002 (EP,KR,US);
B63J2003/046 (EP,KR,US);
H02J2310/42 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/00 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN SCHIFFSANTRIEB | [2013/33] | English: | POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICAL DRIVE OF A MARINE VESSEL | [2013/33] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE POUR LA COMMANDE ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN NAVIRE | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Observations by third parties | 22.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005049418 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 8,12 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP1614621 (ALSTOM POWER CONVERSION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,14,15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]WO2007067064 (MARINE CYBERNETICS AS [NO], et al) [A] 10 * paragraph [0019] *; | [XY]US2008182466 (WEGNER-DONNELLY FRANK [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,13-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0127] * [Y] 8,12; | [A]US2009284228 (KUMAR AJITH KUTTANNAIR [US]) [A] 1,14* the whole document * | Examination | WO2009120062 |