EP2668166 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A PYRAZOLE CARBOXYLIC ACID AMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/49] | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PYRAZOLE CARBOXYLIC ACID AMIDE | ||
[2014/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERINEK, Miroslav Syngenta Crop Protection Muenchwilen AG Breitenloh 5 CH-4333 Muenchwilen / CH | 02 /
FABER, Dominik Syngenta Crop Protection Muenchwilen AG Breitenloh 5 CH-4333 Muenchwilen / CH | 03 /
KOENIG, Stefan Syngenta Crop Protection Muenchwilen AG Breitenloh 5 CH-4333 Muenchwilen / CH | [2014/32] |
Former [2013/49] | 01 /
TERINEK, Miroslav Syngenta Crop Protection Muenchwilen AG Breitenloh 5 CH-4333 Muenchwilen / CH | ||
02 /
FABER, Dominik Syngenta Crop Protection Muenchwilen AG Breitenloh 5 CH-4333 Muenchwilen / CH | |||
03 /
KOENIG, Stefan Syngenta Crop Protection Muenchwilen AG Breitenloh 5 CH-4333 Muenchwilen / CH | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP WRO B8-Z1-30 Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Syngenta International AG WRO-1008-Z1-26 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2014/18] | Syngenta International AG WRO 1008-Z1-26 Schwarzwaldalle 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2013/49] | Hölscher, Ingo Syngenta International AG Intellectual Property WRO-1004-6-22 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12700859.7 | 25.01.2012 | WO2012EP51075 | Priority number, date | EP20110151965 | 25.01.2011 Original published format: EP 11151965 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012101139 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2668166 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2668166 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/14, C07C251/56 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07C251/56 (KR,US);
C07C231/14 (US);
C07C251/64 (EP,US);
C07C329/02 (EP,US);
C07C329/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PYRAZOL-CARBOXYLSÄURE-AMIDEN | [2013/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A PYRAZOLE CARBOXYLIC ACID AMIDE | [2014/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN AMIDE D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE ET DE PYRAZOLE | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/49] | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PYRAZOLE CARBOXYLIC ACID AMIDE | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 16.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.05.2015 | AT | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MK | 13.05.2015 | RS | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | SM | 13.05.2015 | NO | 13.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | IE | 25.01.2016 | LU | 25.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 13.05.2015 | |
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 13.05.2015 | |
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2007048556 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-8* Schemes 1-4 on pages 17-19 *; | [A]WO2009138375 (SYNGENTA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * claim 12 *; | [A]WO2010072631 (SYNGENTA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 25, line 7 - page 26, line 2 *; | [ADP]WO2011015416 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [ADP] 1-8 * claims 1,8 *; | [AP]WO2011131546 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [AP]WO2011131545 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [AP]WO2011131544 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-8 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US5093347 | WO2007048556 | WO2011015416 | - CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1971), vol. 20, page 1293 |