EP2668156 - POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN OXIME SULFONATE AS THERMAL CURING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNIMOTO, Kazuhiko 2-27-12, Keyakizaka Kawanishi, 666-0145 / JP | 02 /
SAMESHIMA, Kaori 3-2-15, Fushiyama Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka, 584-0061 / JP | 03 /
MATSUOKA, Yuki 1-15-402 Toda Nishinomiya, 662-0916 / JP | 04 /
KURA, Hisatoshi 1-15-3, Hobai Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo, 665-0013 / JP | [2018/44] |
Former [2013/49] | 01 /
KUNIMOTO, Kazuhiko 2-27-12 Keyakizaka Kawanishi 666-0145 / JP | ||
02 /
SAMESHIMA, Kaori 3-2-15 Fushiyama Tondabayashi-shi Osaka 584-0061 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUOKA, Yuki 1-15-402 Toda Nishinomiya 662-0916 / JP | |||
04 /
KURA, Hisatoshi 1-15-3 Hobai Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2013/49] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12701354.8 | 27.01.2012 | [2018/44] | WO2012EP51297 | Priority number, date | EP20110152582 | 28.01.2011 Original published format: EP 11152582 | US201161437024P | 28.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437024 P | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012101245 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2668156 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2668156 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/30, C07C327/58, C07D213/59, C07D265/32, C07D277/54, C07D291/02, C07D327/06, H01L21/027 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
G03F7/0007 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/00 (EP,US);
C07C309/67 (US);
C07C309/73 (US);
C07C327/58 (EP,KR,US);
C07C327/60 (EP,US);
C07D213/59 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/78 (EP,US);
C07D265/32 (EP,US);
C07D277/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07D279/12 (EP,US);
C07D291/02 (EP,US);
C07D295/04 (EP,US);
C07D307/10 (EP,US);
C07D309/08 (EP,US);
C07D327/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/10 (EP,US);
G02B5/223 (KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/027 (KR,US);
G03F7/028 (US);
G03F7/029 (EP,US);
G03F7/031 (EP,US);
G03F7/032 (KR,US);
G03F7/322 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM OXIMSULFONAT ALS THERMISCHES HÄRTUNGSMITTEL | [2013/49] | English: | POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN OXIME SULFONATE AS THERMAL CURING AGENT | [2013/49] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÉRISABLE COMPRENANT UN SULFONATE D'OXIME EN TANT QU'AGENT DE DURCISSEMENT THERMIQUE | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 12.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2012 | AL | 31.10.2018 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | IE | 27.01.2019 | LU | 27.01.2019 | MT | 27.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | BG | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.01.2012 | |
AL | 31.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
MT | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
MT | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
MT | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8905805 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]) [A] 43,44 * page 7; compounds 13-14 *; | [X]WO9203050 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 43,44 * page 71; claim 11; table -; compounds 134,135,155 *; | [AD]WO9901429 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] 1-44 * page 49 - page 52; table 1; compounds 25-40,42,51,53 *; | [A]JP2009086357 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-44* page 22 - page 24 *; | [XP] - Ryan Scientific High Throughput Screening Compound Library, CHEMCATS, (20110411), Database accession no. 0066990389, XP002679129 [XP] 43,44 * abstract * | [XP] - Ryan Scientific High Throughput Screening Compound Library, CHEMCATS, (20110411), Database accession no. 0067461735, XP002679130 [XP] 43,44 * abstract * | [A] - WOLFGANG HANEFELD ET AL, "Nitrosierungen an Hydrazinderivaten, 10. Mitt.: Oxidationen an Thiourethanen, 11. Mitt.: Reaktionen von 3-Aminorhodaninen unter nitrosierenden Bedingungen", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, (19930101), vol. 326, no. 11, doi:10.1002/ardp.19933261106, ISSN 0365-6233, pages 871 - 874, XP055010509 [A] 43,44 * page 871; compounds 4,5 * * page 873 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ardp.19933261106 | [AD] - Mitsuru Kitamura ET AL, "Synthesis of Primary Amines and N-Methylamines by the Electrophilic Amination of Grignard Reagents with 2-Imidazolidinone O-Sulfonyloxime", Bull. Chem. Soc. Jpn, (20030101), pages 1063 - 1070, URL: http://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/bcsj/76/5/1063/_pdf, (20111026), XP055010572 [AD] 43,44 * page 1064; compound 13 * * see scheme top of the page; page 1065; compound 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chin.200334051 | [A] - Wolfgang Hanefeld ET AL, "Synthese, Kristallstruktur, Oxidation und Photochemie der Thion-S-oxide cyclischer Dithiourethane und Dithiocarbazate", Liebigs Ann. Chern, (19920101), pages 337 - 344, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/jlac.199219920160/asset/199219920160_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=gu8h75qx&s=19d06b6521c26e6b83f9209192aeeab25e2cb965, (20111026), XP055010577 [A] 43,44 * page 337, column rh; claim 1; table 1; compounds 2k,5k * * page 341, column lh, paragraph 2 * | [A] - BEZDRIK A ET AL, "Über einige Derivate des Thionaphthens", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, WILEY-VCH VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, (19080101), vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1002/CBER.19080410147, ISSN 0365-9496, pages 227 - 242, XP009153542 [A] 43,44 * page 239, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19080410147 | [AD] - ARGYROPOULOS ET AL, Product class 4: 1,4,2-oxathiazoles and related compounds, SCIENCE OF SYNTHESIS. CATEGORY 2 : HETARENES AND RELATED RING SYSTEMS FIVE-MEMBERED HETARENES WITH THREE OF MORE HETEROATOMS; [METHODS OF MOLECULAR TRANSFORMATIONS. (HOUBEN-WEYL)], STUTTGART : GEORG THIEME VERLAG, DE, PAGE(S) 95 - 107, (20040101), ISBN 978-3-13-112281-0, XP009153553 [AD] 43,44 * page 100; table -; compound 23 * | [AD] - DAVIES J H ET AL, "Geometrical isomerism in the S-alkyl thiohydroximate series: a new oxime fragmentation", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, SECTION C: ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (19680101), doi:10.1039/J3968000431, ISSN 0022-4952, pages 431 - 435, XP009153570 [AD] 43,44 * see first reaction scheme; page 432, column lh, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/J3968000431 | by applicant | JPS5742009 | EP0048615 | EP0064091 | EP0126541 | JPS6011409 | EP0174046 | GB2180358 | JPS6490516 | JPH01130103 | JPH01134306 | EP0320264 | WO8905805 | EP0339841 | EP0438123 | EP0441232 | EP0497531 | JPH05173320 | JPH0668309 | JPH06230212 | US5368976 | JPH08305019 | EP0780729 | JPH09179299 | JPH09269410 | JPH09325209 | JPH1010718 | US5719008 | JPH10171119 | JPH10221843 | US5800952 | US5821016 | EP0881541 | US5847015 | WO9901429 | US5863678 | US5866298 | US5879855 | US5882843 | EP0902327 | JPH11174459 | JPH11174464 | JP2000081701 | US6261738 | WO0225376 | US6410612 | JP2002206014 | JP2003015288 | JP2003330184 | JP2004026804 | JP2004069754 | WO2004074242 | JP2004302245 | JP2005077451 | WO2005080337 | JP2005316449 | JP2005338328 | JP3754065B | WO2007062963 | WO2007071797 | WO2007071497 | US2008014675 | WO2008078678 | JP2010015025 | JP2010049238 | - W. HANEFELD ET AL., ARCH. PHARM. (WEINHEIM, (1993), vol. 326, pages 871 - 874 | - W. HANEFELD ET AL., LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1992), pages 337 - 344 | - A. BEZDRIK ET AL., BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1908), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 227 - 242 | - N. BALDOVINI; M. KITAMURA; K. NARASAKA, CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2003), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 548 - 549 | - M. KITAMURA; S. CHIBA; K. NARASAKA, BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN, (2003), pages 1063 - 1070 | - K. AKIBA; H. SHIRAISHI; N. INAMOTO, BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, vol. 52, pages 263 - 264 | - SCIENCE OF SYNTHESIS, (2004), vol. 13, pages 95 - 107 | - J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1988), vol. 1, pages 899 - 906 | - J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN., (1985), pages 1641 - 2 | - J. H. DAVIES; R.H. DAVIES; P. KIRBY, JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY [SECTION C]: ORGANIC, (1968), pages 431 - 435 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1972), vol. 28, pages 2267 - 2283 | - MODELS IN CHEMISTRY, vol. 131, no. 3-4, pages 529 - 534 | - SYNLETT, (2001), page 937 | - J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1999), vol. 1, page 1789 | - J. HETEROCYCLIC CHEM., (2006), vol. 43, page 579 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2006), vol. 47, no. 51, page 9029 | - J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1991), vol. 1, page 2627 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1980), vol. 45, page 3916 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1983), vol. 48, no. 3, page 366 | - ORGANIC SYNTHESES, COLL., (1955), vol. 3, page 191 | - R6mpp-Lexikon, Lac- ke und Druckfarben, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1998), page 250 FF | - T. KUDO ET AL., JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (1998), vol. 37, page 3594 | - T. KUDO ET AL., J. PHOTOPOLYM. SCI. TECHNOL., (1996), vol. 9, page 109 | - K. KOBAYASHI, SOLID STATE TECHNOL., (199211), pages S15 - S18 |