Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014021939 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP50498 | 13.01.2012 | DE102011002756 | 17.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012208714 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP50498 | 13.01.2012 | DE102011002756 | 17.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666023 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | B1 | EP2666023 | 27.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP50498 | 13.01.2012 | DE102011002756 | 17.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012098054 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011002756 | 17.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011002756 | 19.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011002756 | 17.01.2011 |