EP2670902 - METHOD FOR REMOVING SHOT FROM MINERAL FIBRE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/50] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING SHOT FROM MINERAL FIBRE MATERIAL | ||
[2019/35] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwool International A/S Hovedgaden 584 2640 Hedehusene / DK | [2017/06] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Rockwool International A/S 584 Hovedgaden 2460 Hedehusene / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHIJZEN, Cor, J., M. Chris Plitscherlaan 20 6114 MZ Susteren / NL | 02 /
KESSELS, Pedro, H., J. Meander 105 6071 SC Swalmen / NL | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/50] | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12701521.2 | 30.01.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012EP51458 | Priority number, date | EP20110152799 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: EP 11152799 | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012104255 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670902 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670902 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2670902 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/70, D04H1/72, C03C13/06, D04H1/732 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
D04H1/732 (EP,US);
C03C13/06 (EP,US);
D04H1/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/52] | C03C13/06, D04H1/732 | ||
Former IPC [2013/50] | D04H1/70, D04H1/72, C03B37/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON FASERGRANULAT AUS EINEM MINERALFASERMATERIAL | [2019/35] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING SHOT FROM MINERAL FIBRE MATERIAL | [2019/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DES AMAS GRANULAIRES DANS UN MATÉRIAU EN FIBRE MINÉRALE | [2019/35] |
Former [2013/50] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON SCHROT AUS EINEM MINERALFASERMATERIAL | ||
Former [2013/50] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING SHOT FROM MINERAL FIBRE MATERIAL | ||
Former [2013/50] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉLIMINATION D'UN FIL DE TRAME PRÉSENT DANS UN MATÉRIAU EN FIBRE MINÉRALE | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 12.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2017/25] | 27.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.07.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.11.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.05.2019 | Appeal received No. T1364/19 | 11.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | IS | 17.12.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | GB | 30.01.2017 | IE | 30.01.2017 | LU | 30.01.2017 | MT | 30.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.08.2016 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2317895 (DRILL DANIEL C) [A] 15-18 * figure 1 *; | [X]US3792943 (HELGESSON J) [X] 1-3,7-9,12 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US3834869 (ANCELLE B, et al) [A] 15-18 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2069876 (AMFU LTD) [X] 1-3,7 * page 2, lines 54-69; figure . *; | [A]EP0100942 (WALTER JIM CORP [US]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [XP]WO2011012712 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK], et al) [XP] 1-12 * page 9, lines 16-24; figure . * | Opposition | US2609313 | US3133319 | US3308945 | GB2069876 | WO2011012712 | WO2012013810 |