EP2667821 - ORAL CARE DEVICES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNEIL-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDONOUGH, Justin, E. 11 Cider Mill Circle Flemington NJ 08822 / US | 02 /
FOUGERE, Richard, J. 61 Hessian Run Road Washington Crossing PA 18977 / US | 03 /
FUSI, Robert, W. 9 Sutton Farm Road Flemington NJ 08822 / US | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/49] | Application number, filing date | 12701975.0 | 24.01.2012 | WO2012US22326 | Priority number, date | US201161435862P | 25.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161435862 P | US201213353487 | 19.01.2012 Original published format: US201213353487 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012103066 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2667821 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/02 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
A61C17/0202 (EP,US);
A61C17/0211 (EP,US);
A61C17/0205 (EP,US);
A61C17/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEVORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME | [2013/49] | English: | ORAL CARE DEVICES AND SYSTEMS | [2013/49] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES D'HYGIÈNE BUCCODENTAIRE | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 27.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3840992 (ENGLISH V) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 20 * * claims 1-6, 8, 11 * * figures 1-8A *; | [XI]WO0197709 (SCHLIMBACH GUENTHER [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 2, line 13 - line 31 * * page 4, line 19 - line 26 * * page 9, line 17 - page 10, line 10 * * page 12, line 3 - page 13, line 7 * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 10 * * figures 2, 5-8 * [I] 13; | [E]WO2012018555 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US], et al) [E] 1-13 * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0158] - paragraph [0160] ** paragraph [0230] - paragraph [0232] * |