EP2676396 - IMPLICITLY LINKING APERIODIC CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION (A-CSI) REPORTS TO CSI-REFERENCE SIGNAL (CSI-RS) RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEIRHOFER, Stefan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
BHATTAD, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 07 /
JI, Tingfang 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2014/02] | Brinck, David John Borchardt R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/52] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12702402.4 | 30.01.2012 | [2018/21] | WO2012US23174 | Priority number, date | US201161444568P | 18.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161444568 P | US201161444979P | 21.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161444979 P | US201161524034P | 16.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161524034 P | US201213359154 | 26.01.2012 Original published format: US201213359154 | US201213360348 | 27.01.2012 Original published format: US201213360348 | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012112291 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676396 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2676396 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/06, H04B7/024 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
H04B7/0626 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/00 (KR);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L1/0026 (US);
H04L1/0687 (US);
H04L1/0693 (US);
H04L5/0023 (US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/10 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/52] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLIZITE VERKNÜPFUNG VON APERIODISCHEN KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONSBERICHTEN MIT CSI-REFERENZSIGNALRESSOURCEN | [2013/52] | English: | IMPLICITLY LINKING APERIODIC CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION (A-CSI) REPORTS TO CSI-REFERENCE SIGNAL (CSI-RS) RESOURCES | [2013/52] | French: | LIAISON IMPLICITE ENTRE DES RAPPORTS DE DONNÉES D'ÉTAT DE CANAL APÉRIODIQUES (A-CSI) ET DES RESSOURCES DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE CSI (CSI-RS) | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 07.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 16.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.05.2018 | AT | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | PT | 24.09.2018 | IE | 30.01.2019 | LU | 30.01.2019 | MT | 30.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/31] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | LT | 23.05.2018 | |
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 23.05.2018 | |
NO | 23.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Discussion on CQI Reference Resource", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110144, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110112), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050490317 [X] 1,12,23,29,36,43,50 * section 2 * [I] 2-11,13-22,24-28,30-35,37-42,44-49 | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "CSI measurement reference", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110337 CSI MEASUREMENT REFERENCE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110111), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050474483 [X] 1,12,23,29,36,43,50 * sections 2.1.2, 2.2.2, 2.3 and 2.4 * [I] 2-11,13-22,24-28,30-35,37-42,44-49 | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Remaining issues on CSI RS signalling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105131, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an; 20101011, XP050450352 [A] 1-50 * section 1 and 2 * | [A] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Further Details on CSI RS Configuration", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105322_CSI_RS_CONFIG, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an; 20101011, XP050450483 [A] 1-50 * section 2 * | Examination | - HUAWEI, "Consideration on CSI-RS design for CoMP and text proposal to 36.814", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-093031 CONSIDERATION ON CSI-RS DESIGN FOR COMP AND TEXT PROPOSAL TO 36.814, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090818), no. Shenzhen, China; 20090818, XP050351428 | - HUAWEI ET AL, "Triggering and transmission of aperiodic CSI reports", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105838, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101109), vol. RAN WG1, no. Jacksonville, USA; 20101115, XP050466693 | - PANTECH, "Feedback issues for Macro site CoMP", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110756, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110217), vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050490755 |